Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1339 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 14, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Amended

Bill March 25, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024