House | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |