Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/28/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/16/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/16/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services sub-committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appr/Sub-Natural Resources and Regulatory Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Paxton
|
|
|