Senate | 04/25/2024 | Becomes law without Governor's signature 04/25/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 3 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Haste |