House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Title restored | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Coauthored by Representative West (Josh) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |