House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |