Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
SCs named Rogers, Paxton, Green, Woods, Kidd, Dossett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Nichols, Schreiber, Waldron, Blancett, Swope, Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert, Provenzano, Goodwin
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Remove Representative Hilbert as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sims
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Sims
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/26/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Sims
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Dossett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative May
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Marti
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Rader
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Gollihare
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|