Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
SCs named Thompson (Roger), Rosino, Haste, Stanley, Pemberton, Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Remove as author Senator Rosino; authored by Senator Thompson (Roger)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|