Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1417 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 29, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 18, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024