Senate
|
06/05/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/05/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 52 Nays: 38; Ayes: 68 Nays: 15
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
SCs named Thompson (Kristen), Coleman, Pugh, Haste, Weaver, Seifried, Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Swope
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/12/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Osburn (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen)
|
|
|