Senate
|
05/08/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/08/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hays, Swope
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Hall
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Harris
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Weaver
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|