Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1457 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 2, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2024