Senate | 05/02/2023 | Approved by Governor 05/02/2023 | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/26/2023 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/26/2023 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2023 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate | ||
House | 04/25/2023 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2023 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/27/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/23/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Dempsey (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/09/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Hicks |