Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB147 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 27, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 26, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023