House
|
04/24/2024
|
Veto override message received
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Measure sent to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Veto overridden: Ayes: 46 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Vetoed 04/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Swope
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Moore, Munson, Stark, Williams, Fugate, Schreiber, Waldron
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/28/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative McDugle
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Wolfley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Roberts
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Treat
|
|
|