Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1470 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2024