House | 04/15/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Treat |