Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1491 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024