House | 04/18/2024 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/12/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 10 | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Emergency added | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Garvin | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) |