Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1512 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 19, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024