House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 14 Nays: 74 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Emergency failed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 14 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 14 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative McDugle | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Hasenbeck (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Daniels |