Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1521 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024