Senate | 04/18/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | Coauthored by Senator(s) Stephens | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Sterling (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Green |