Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1524 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024