Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1535 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 2, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024