Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1550 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 5, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill March 25, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024