House
|
05/16/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
SCs named Rader, Paxton, Green, Deevers, Newhouse, Woods, Dossett
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Archer
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Energy and Natural Resources Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rader
|
|
|