Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1568 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024

Amended

Bill April 11, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024