Senate | 04/18/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 5 | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 4 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Reported Do Pass Energy and Telecommunications committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Energy and Telecommunications | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Rader |