Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1574 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill February 26, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024