House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/04/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Howard |