Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1592 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 9, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2024

Amended

Bill March 25, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024