House | 03/29/2023 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 03/27/2023 | Remove Representative Conley as principal House author and substitute with Representative Lawson | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 03/01/2023 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/13/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Conley (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Bullard |