Senate | 04/18/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/18/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/15/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Deck | ||
House | 04/15/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/01/2024 | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/27/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Young | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) |