Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1617 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 27, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 16, 2024

Amended

Bill April 2, 2024
Bill February 12, 2024