Senate | 04/30/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/30/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/08/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/26/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Vancuren (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Seifried |