Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1631 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 25, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 14, 2024