House | 04/11/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Rules | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/05/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 03/04/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/08/2024 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Prieto |