Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB168 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2023

Amended

Bill April 6, 2023
Bill February 14, 2023