House | 04/18/2024 | Enacting clause stricken | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Title stricken | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | Withdrawn from Judiciary - Civil Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil | ||
Senate | 03/11/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/11/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 8 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Dahm |