Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2024
|
SCs named Daniels, Rosino, Haste, Gollihare, Stanley, Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|