Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1703 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Amended

Bill April 18, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 29, 2024