Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1705 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 29, 2024
Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 27, 2024