Senate | 04/22/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/19/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 4 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Gollihare | ||
Senate | 02/29/2024 | Remove as author Senator Gollihare; authored by Senator Hamilton | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Gollihare |