Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1707 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 17, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 7, 2024