Senate | 04/26/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Swope, Deck, Pittman | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal | ||
Senate | 03/13/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/12/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Hill (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Howard |