Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1724 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024