Senate | 04/22/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/19/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/16/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Swope | ||
House | 04/16/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 03/27/2024 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Public Health | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Boatman (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Gollihare |