Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/22/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Swope, Hefner, Pittman
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Common Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|