Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB175 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 21, 2023

Enrolled

Bill May 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 22, 2023